SOUTHERN GOLDEN RETRIEVER RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alleviate distress caused to the breed of dog known as Golden Retrievers which may be ill treated, abandoned or neglected. In cases where Golden Retrievers are abandoned or unwanted, or the dogs can no longer be cared for in their present homes, to re-home the Golden Retrievers to ensure their future well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE HOAD | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Tinham | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||
NIGEL PORTER | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clark | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Ferguson | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|||||
SUE ASHLEY | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.67k | £91.91k | £19.09k | £35.14k | £34.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £36.88k | £18.24k | £95.76k | £84.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 JULY 2003 as amended on 06 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO ALLEVIATE DISTRESS CAUSED TO THE BREED OF DOGS KNOWN AS GOLDEN RETRIEVERS WHICH MAY BE ILL-TREATED ABANDONED OR NEGLECTED; 2) IN CASES WHERE GOLDEN RETRIEVERS ARE ABANDONED OR UNWANTED OR THE DOGS CAN NO LONGER BE CARED FOR AT THEIR PRESENT HOMES TO RE-HOME THE GOLDEN RETRIEVERS TO ENSURE THEIR FUTURE WELL BEING AND WHERE POSSIBLE TO KEEP IN CONTACT WITH THEM FOR THE DURATION OF THEIR LIVES; AND 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO OWN OR WHO WISH TO OWN A GOLDEN RETRIEVER IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE AND WELL-BEING OF SUCH DOGS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Swale Road
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 2TT
- Phone:
- 07480100344
- Email:
- admin@sgrr.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window