THE KASANKA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds for conservation,wildlife and community projects in and around the Kasanka Trust National Park in N. Zambia. Recent projects include educational and healthcare schemes, anti-poaching activities, wildlife monitoring and introducing chilli fences to control elephant crop damage in local villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 16 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Janette Mathews | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Ebeling | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rollo Alexander Powlett Wood | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retd Jonathan Stewart Lloyd | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ROLAND BARNABAS SPENCER FISHER | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS MAXWELL THOMAS MCCULLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £17.92k | £15.80k | £38.73k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £732 | £32.42k | £37.20k | £11.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 9TH APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN HOLISTIC RESOURCES MANAGEMENT WITH REGARD TO THE KASANKA NATIONAL PARK AND ASSOCIATED WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT AND RURAL DEVELOPMENT AREAS IN TH REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA. B) SECURE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE WORLDS ANIMAL, BIRD, FISH AND PLANT LIFE, ITS INDUSTRIAL, URBAN, RURAL NATURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS OF ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE, AND ITS NATURAL RESOURCES BUT WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE KASANKA NATIONAL PARK IN THE REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA AND ITS ENBIRONS, AND ON OTHER ENVIRONMENTS IN THE REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA. C) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF NATURAL HISTORY, ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES, ECOLOGY AND RESOURCE CONSERVATION IN INDUSTRIAL, URBAN, RURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. D) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF OPPORTUNITIES AND RESOURCES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA IN CONNECTION WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS OR UNEMPLOYED
Area of benefit
AFRICA, ZAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Downsway
Guildford
GU1 2YA
- Phone:
- 01483539484
- Email:
- michael@mwhpconsulting.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window