ARISTOCAT RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue and rehome stray unwanted and homeless cats and kittens. Advice given on cat related matters, when funds allow helping neuter and spay cats whose owners cannot afford to pay for. Help with homing cats and kittens that are still with their owners. Keep lost and found register details are placed on our web site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 07 July 2003: Standard registration
- 11 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 11 November 2016: Funds transferred to 1116552 ARK ON THE EDGE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.98k | £13.22k | £8.91k | £8.58k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.06k | £10.46k | £8.35k | £7.92k | £6.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 23 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 17 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 07 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST STRAY AND UNWANTED CATS (AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH RESCUING, RE-HOMING OR ARRANGING THE SPAYING AND NEUTERING OF CATS AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE OF CATS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window