CONSENSUS ACTION ON SALT, SUGAR AND HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Identification of those who suffer from the effects of, or whose health is more at risk from salt or sugar intake; to advance education of the effects of salt & sugar and disseminate research into the effects of salt & sugar; to promote the benefit of a reduction in salt & sugar intake and to increase the understanding, awareness and recognition of the effects of salt & sugar intake on health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 July 2003: Standard registration
- ACTION ON SALT (Working name)
- ACTION ON SUGAR (Working name)
- CASH (Working name)
- WASH (Working name)
- WORLD ACTION ON SALT (Working name)
- WORLD ACTION ON SALT AND HEALTH (Working name)
- WORLD ACTION ON SUGAR (Working name)
- CONSENSUS ACTION ON SALT AND HEALTH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR GRAHAM MACGREGOR | Chair |
|
||||||
Professor Feng He | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MALCOLM LAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR PETER SEVER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.93k | £113.17k | £66.74k | £96.43k | £371.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.39k | £84.63k | £169.53k | £180.99k | £220.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £80.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15TH JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: I) THE IDENTIFICATION AND RELIEF OF THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM THE EFFECTS OF A HIGH SALT OR SUGAR INTAKE OR WHOSE HEALTH IS MORE AT RISK FROM A HIGH SALT OR SUGAR INTAKE; II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND TRAINING ON THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE ON HEALTH AND TO UNDERTAKE AND DISSEMINATE RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR ON HEALTH; III) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS A REDUCTION IN SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE AND TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING, AWARENESS AND RECOGNITION OF THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE ON HEALTH; IV) IDENTIFICATION OF THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM THE EFFECTS OF, OR WHOSE HEALTH IS MORE AT RISK FROM A HIGH SALT OR SUGAR INTAKE; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE AND DISSEMINATE RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR; TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF A REDUCTION IN SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE AND TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING, AWARENESS AND RECOGNITION OF THE EFFECTS OF SALT AND SUGAR INTAKE ON HEALTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wolfson Institute of Preventive
Medicine
Charterhouse Square
LONDON
EC1M 6BQ
- Phone:
- 07951905449
- Email:
- salt@qmul.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window