Financial history THE WELLS CATHEDRAL CHORISTER TRUST

Charity Number: 1098277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £80.51k £222.62k £144.78k £117.87k £393.85k
Total expenditure £58.81k £64.08k £79.60k £72.39k £133.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A