RICHMOND TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pursue the objects of the charity with all the resources available to the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JERRY FRIED | Chair |
|
||||||
JUDITH FRIED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARON IWANIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.28k | £15.03k | £95.51k | £724.14k | £220.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.27k | £124.93k | £80.89k | £307.58k | £323.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £716.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £307.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £306.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE ELDERLY OR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 RICHMOND TERRACE
GATESHEAD
NE8 1RN
- Phone:
- 0161 772 0099
- Email:
- jerryfried@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window