MORLAND CHORISTERS' CAMP

Charity number: 1104768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's Object is the advancement of education and religion by the organisation and provision of chorister courses. The main activity is the administration of the Morland Choristers' Camp, a week-long 100-strong residential course primarily intended for boys and girls aged 9-17 who are members of church or school choirs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £28,487
Total expenditure: £29,055

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Beddison Chair 04 November 2023
None on record
Donald William Gillthorpe Trustee 04 August 2024
None on record
Gabriel Garry Cooper Trustee 04 August 2024
None on record
Joanne Verona Thomlinson Trustee 04 November 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WIGTON
Received: On time
Emma Louise Richardson Trustee 06 August 2023
None on record
Jennifer Mary Johnson Trustee 06 August 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WIGTON
Received: On time
Rev Stephen William Tudway Trustee 21 January 2023
CROSBY RAVENSWORTH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Received: 112 days late
THE LONSDALE FOUNDATION AT SHAP
Received: On time
CATHERINE MARTIN Trustee 28 July 2019
None on record
MARK DUTHIE Trustee 03 November 2017
None on record
MARILYN PRESCOTT Trustee 04 November 2013
None on record
REVD STEWART FYFE Trustee
None on record
FRANCES WINIFRED YEOWART Trustee
HENLEY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
MR NICK WILLMER Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH NATELY SCURES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £42.83k £8.39k £13.88k £31.66k £28.49k
Total expenditure £34.48k £1.06k £26.93k £32.09k £29.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 06 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 13 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEWBY END FARM
NEWBY
PENRITH
CA10 3EX
Phone:
01931714338