THE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of funding to advance the education of the public in the science and practice of radio communication and electrical engineering. The support of A-level students with a keen interest in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
- 05 September 2017: Funds received from 1073091 STELAR
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR SIR MARTIN NICHOLAS SWEETING | Chair |
|
||||||
Andrew John Webster | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mortlock | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Livesey | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Tite | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cathryn Mitchell | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Trevor Michael Gill | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|||||
STEVE HARTLEY | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY HENDON CBE FRENG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.48k | £8.21k | £10.65k | £13.85k | £13.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.65k | £10.67k | £8.99k | £8.07k | £10.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF RADIO COMMUNICATION AND ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING AND TO PROMOTE THE WIDER BENEFITS TO THE PUBLIC RESULTING FROM SUCH EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Radio Society of Great Britain
3 Abbey Court
Fraser Road
Priory Business Park
Bedford
MK44 3WH
- Phone:
- 01234832700
- Email:
- jackie.tite@rsgb.org.uk
- Website:
-
commsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window