Financial history Power2 Ltd

Charity number: 1099782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.04m £1.22m £1.19m £2.31m £2.36m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.15m £1.14m £2.25m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £196.20k N/A £24.17k £616.47k £917.06k
Income from government grants N/A £302.03k £93.21k N/A £144.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £882.01k £1.15m £955.99k £86.44k £96.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £1.02m £923.89k
Income - Charitable activities £157.32k £64.49k £235.14k £1.20m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £820 £181 £24 £0 £3.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £740 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £930.45k £928.05k £1.91m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £182.39k £220.48k £214.97k £334.30k £215.74k
Expenditure - Governance £8.79k £10.96k £12.14k £0 £18.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0