THE TEW CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object is to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Great and Little Tew and the neighbourhood to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of local welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation and for such charitable purposes as the trustees shall decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Stanley Best Johnstone | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Malcolm Freeman | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Patrick Thomas | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE GWYNETH BENNETT | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|||||
PAUL CATLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEV TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.49k | £15.35k | £13.11k | £7.39k | £7.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.75k | £7.99k | £4.91k | £17.02k | £17.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2004 AND AS AMENDED 14 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHAITANTANTS OF GREAT AND LITTLE TEW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OF OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE..
Area of benefit
GREAT AND LITTLE TEW
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Tew Centre
Ledwell Road
Great Tew
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 4AF
- Phone:
- 01608 683896
- Email:
- chair@tewcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window