FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH WICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the maintenance,repair,preservation,improvement,beautification and reconstruction for the benefit of the public the fabric of the Parish Church and churchyard of the Parish Church of Wick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward David Farmer Reid Haines | Chair | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew John Smart | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Steven Mark Bowyer | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Clair Meikle - Taylor | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Mary Phillips | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
NANCY CHRISTINA PRISCOTT | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN LILLIAN KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Steven Thrush | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £4.54k | £4.30k | £4.23k | £4.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £0 | £4.08k | £3.38k | £4.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF WICK IN THE DIOCESE OF WORCESTER AND TO PRESERVE AND TO PROTECT 'THE CHURCH' AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
Main Street
Wick
PERSHORE
Worcestershire
WR10 3NZ
- Phone:
- 01386 552204
- Email:
- mrspriscott@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window