CYMDEITHAS CYFEILLION LLYFRGELL GENEDLAETHOL CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds meetings and lectures for members to learn about the collections and activities of The National Library of Wales and helps to raise income for the Library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
- ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL LIBRARY OF WALES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwenda Sippings | Chair | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Siberry OBE | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pedr ap Llwyd | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £9.09k | £8.77k | £8.99k | £15.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £8.79k | £0 | £562 | £680 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH THE PROMOTION SUPPORT ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATIONAL LIBRARY OF WALES ('THE LIBRARY') THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS. AMCANION Y GYMDEITHAS YW HYRWYDDO ADDYSG, GWYBODAETH GYHOEDDUS A DEALLTWRIAETH TRWY HYBU CEFNOGI HELPU A GWELLA LLYFRGELL GENEDLAETHOL CYMRU ('Y LLYFRGELL') TRWY WEITHGAREDDAU GRWP O GYFEILLION ('YR AMCANION').
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
LLYFRGELL GENEDLAETHOL CYMRU
PENGLAIS
ABERYSTWYTH
CEREDIGION
SY23 3BU
- Phone:
- 01970632806
- Email:
- cyfeillion@llgc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window