THE PATER HALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community hall for the residents of Pembroke Dock.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 23 July 2004: Standard registration
- THE PATER HALL COMMUNITY TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margret Hart | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Phillips | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|||||
PAUL ASTON-JONES | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE FRANCIS | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BOWEN | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
WENDY O' DRISCOLL | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN O'CONNOR | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Meg Burrell | Trustee | 18 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM GEORGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICIA THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DON ESMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.28k | £38.24k | £27.75k | £50.90k | £58.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.34k | £16.63k | £37.75k | £32.55k | £47.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £34.19k | £2.00k | N/A | £23.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
20 October 2022 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 FEBRUARY 2004. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 12 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PEMBROKE DOCK SOUTH PEMBROKESHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONS AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PEMBROKE DOCK, SOUTH PEMBROKESHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pater Hall
Lewis Street
PEMBROKE DOCK
SA72 6DD
- Phone:
- 01646622788
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window