FARESHARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FareShare redistributes surplus good quality food that would otherwise have gone to waste to charitable organisations around the UK for the production of meals for those most in need. The organisation also provides educational, advice and training for staff, volunteers and clients of those organisations as well as to its own volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£23,067,000
Donations and legacies | £18.71m | |
Charitable activities | £3.18m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £820.00k | |
Other | £355.00k |
Total expenditure:
£27,190,000
Raising funds | £3.86m | |
Charitable activities | £23.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£58,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £367,440 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £23.33m |
People

234 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
26600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GEORGE BASON | Chair |
|
||||||
Alex Hyde-Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Angela Tangas | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kenward | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Ryan | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aron Gelbard | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy O'Malley | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Betts | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Blakemore | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simone Connolly | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juergen Pinker | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD KING | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Adam James Eisenstadt | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Michelle Yotov | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hood | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Murray Raynor Hinton | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.08m | £72.07m | £20.30m | £23.06m | £23.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.32m | £50.16m | £18.11m | £27.17m | £27.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £90.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.90m | £30.45m | £1.35m | £1.09m | £367.44k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.16m | £69.23m | £17.43m | £19.47m | £18.71m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £187.00k | £265.00k | £422.00k | £355.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.71m | £2.40m | £2.43m | £2.97m | £3.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.00k | £9.00k | £1.00k | £248.00k | £820.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £24.00k | £157.00k | £21.00k | £14.00k | £355.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £124.61k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.65m | £49.34m | £17.13m | £24.40m | £23.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £665.00k | £816.00k | £981.00k | £2.77m | £3.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £59.00k | £104.00k | £72.00k | £129.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £500.00k | £4.78m | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £587.00k | £799.00k | £551.00k | £659.00k | £709.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.01m | £6.16m | |
|
Other assets | £10.43m | £33.69m | £33.04m | £28.30m | £19.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.28m | £6.84m | £3.75m | £4.23m | £4.75m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 27 Jun 2022 as amended on 27 Jun 2022 as amended on 24 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
(a) The charity's objects (the Objects) are specifically restricted to the following: A. The prevention and relief of poverty and the preservation and promotion of good nutrition, good health and social improvement among people who are suffering from social, economic or emotional distress in such ways as the trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit but particularly through: (A) the collection and redistribution of surplus food; and (B) the encouragement of members of the public to undertake voluntary work; B. the advancement of public education in particular but not exclusively by providing training in the voluntary sector; C. the furtherance, for the benefit of the public, of the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment through the reduction of waste (in particular food waste) and its adverse environmental impacts (b) Nothing in these articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Collar Factory
Building 3, Floors 1 & 2
2 Old Street Yard
London
EC1Y 8AF
- Phone:
- 02073942468
- Email:
- enquiries@fareshare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window