BRITISH FRIENDS OF BOYS TOWN JERUSALEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds through events, appeals and legacies to send to Boys Town Jerusalem in Israel, a school for Jewish boys who mainly come from disadvantaged backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Garbacz | Chair | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Joseph Lazarus | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
His Honour Nigel Lloyd Lithman QC | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL IAN BAUM | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Moshi | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STUART STANTON | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.38k | £256.91k | £226.82k | £254.11k | £160.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.74k | £366.88k | £196.95k | £266.46k | £252.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 August 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE INSTITUTION IN ISRAEL KNOWN AS "BOYS TOWN JERUSALEM" IN PROVIDING CARE, EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL AND OTHER TRAINING AND FACILITIES FOR ITS PUPILS.
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Schaller House
44A Albert Road
LONDON
NW4 2SJ
- Phone:
- 02080908421
- Email:
- office@btj.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window