Financial history BRITISH NEUROSCIENCE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1103852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £223.98k £163.50k £404.42k £322.93k £434.30k
Total expenditure £233.41k £250.75k £319.24k £364.73k £409.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A