SEAN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the Christian Faith and Ministry by the development and production of Christian Literature and materials in the United Kingdom. 2. To distribute such literature and materials and otherwise to advance the education and training of the Christain Faith within Christian Churches and Christian Organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Scotland
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nichola Jane Kinloch Terry | Chair | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Josep Miquel Rosello Ferrer | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Seymour | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.94k | £33.52k | £26.78k | £30.26k | £30.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.59k | £33.57k | £26.51k | £29.79k | £31.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND MINISTRY BY DEVELOPING THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION PRINCIPALLY BY DEVELOPING, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND MATERIALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salway House
Clappentail Lane
LYME REGIS
DT7 3LZ
- Phone:
- 07983514094
- Email:
- admin@sean.uk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window