NEW FOUNDATIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide primary care programs, health care worker training, immunisation , surgical and public health initiatives in the region of the Niger Delta. To train, resource and remunerate local workers, and to partner with government and other NGO's in work that is driven and underpinned through a faith in Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nigeria
Governance
- 14 November 2003: Standard registration
- 18 April 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1161188 NEW FOUNDATIONS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.56k | £60.63k | £71.21k | £74.38k | £89.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.76k | £45.87k | £58.76k | £65.15k | £74.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 29 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN AFRICA, INDIA AND THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO MEDICAL TREATMENT WHERE NO TREATMENT AND FACILITIES ARE CURRENTLY AVAILABLE AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF TREATMENT CAMPS WHERE APPROPRIATE BASED ON THE ASSESSMENT OF THE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA, INDIA AND UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window