STANSTED PARK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stansted Park Foundation is a landed charitable Trust which owns and administers the Stansted Park Estate in West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,887,686
Donations and legacies | £24.83k | |
Charitable activities | £403.22k | |
Other trading activities | £165.84k | |
Investments | £1.28m | |
Other | £13.44k |
Total expenditure:
£1,706,645
Raising funds | £560.33k | |
Charitable activities | £1.15m | |
Other | £0 |
£85,028 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £153,555 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £560.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.15m | |
Retained for future use | £181.04k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £560.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.15m | |
Retained for future use | £266.07k |
People

14 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Robert Bailie | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Webster | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aleramo Lanza | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Frances Daniel | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES ALEXANDER WATES | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Frederick Arthur William Viscount Duncannon | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAX DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YANNI PETSOPOULOS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95m | £1.37m | £1.52m | £1.71m | £1.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06m | £1.27m | £1.37m | £1.55m | £1.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £145.01k | £76.43k | £90.44k | £96.48k | £153.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £91.17k | £37.20k | £27.57k | £31.51k | £24.83k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £231.74k | £39.78k | £92.64k | £131.96k | £165.84k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £307.85k | £182.37k | £297.91k | £337.27k | £403.22k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.29m | £1.04m | £1.09m | £1.20m | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Other | £20.67k | £68.98k | £14.89k | £18.13k | £13.44k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.29m | £809.17k | £900.95k | £1.06m | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £767.81k | £460.74k | £473.73k | £483.90k | £560.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.24k | £9.72k | £9.95k | £10.34k | £11.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £493.67k | £10.22k | £425.20k | £406.02k | £3.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £20.55m | £20.54m | £20.62m | £18.28m | £18.27m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.86m | £19.75m | £19.86m | £31.64m | £32.29m | |
|
Other assets | £387.70k | £535.93k | £897.59k | £1.19m | £734.86k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.36m | £1.35m | £1.38m | £1.83m | £1.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 SEP 2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE BUILDINGS AND THEIR GROUNDS AND SURROUNDING PARKLAND, FARMLAND AND FOREST KNOWN AS STANSTED PARK IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘STANSTED PARK’); 3.2 THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF FURNITURE AND PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION CONNECTED WITH STANSTED PARK, THE PONSONBY FAMILY OR OTHERWISE APPROPRIATE TO BE KEPT AT STANSTED PARK; 3.3 THE PROVISION AT STANSTED PARK OR SUCH PART OF IT AS SHALL BE APPROPRIATE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE INTENDED OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION WHICH WILL BE AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 3.4 THE FACILITATION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF THE WHOLE OR PART OF STANSTED PARK AND THE USE OF SUCH CHATTELS AS AFORESAID FOR CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE; 3.5 THE FURTHERANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
STANSTED PARK IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANSTED PARK FOUNDATION
STANSTED PARK
ROWLAND'S CASTLE
PO9 6DX
- Phone:
- 02392412265
- Email:
- enquiry@stanstedpark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window