Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF FROME CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1100424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £28.56k £54.38k £198.67k £222.14k £45.51k
Total expenditure £37.27k £57.74k £150.49k £221.85k £76.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A