Financial history SWINDON OLD TOWN ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1101291
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.74k £3.82k £16.20k £17.36k £19.54k
Total expenditure £1.98k £1.69k £13.76k £2.75k £12.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A