ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE COMMONWEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Royal Agricultural Society of the Commonwealth encourages the interchange of information about and the development of sustainable agriculture, forestry, and aquaculture and the rural environment throughout the Commonwealth. The principal objective is to hold a biennial Commonwealth Conference giving RASC members and other bodies the opportunity to explore mutual interests and problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 December 2003: Standard registration
- RASC (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nicholas Hickman Ponsonby Bacon Bt KCVO | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Robert Nicholas Foord Drewett | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM BURGESS | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
BREYTON DEVON MILFORD | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
REBECCA JAYNE DAWES | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
William F Arnot | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Alan George Crowe | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Christopher Paul Riddle | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Johannes Carel Ehlers | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Aled Rhys Jones | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
William Hyde | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Christine Knipe | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ALLAN MURRAY | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
WILLIAM PRICHARD | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
SIMON ORPWOOD | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
DAVID THOMAS | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
JOHN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
MR M LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.49k | £36.23k | £19.59k | £56.04k | £18.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.39k | £72.47k | £223 | £9.80k | £15.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 2006 as amended on 29 Jun 2022 as amended on 03 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST EDUCATION IN AGRICULTURE AND FORESTRY WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE EFFICIENT UTILISATION OF LAND GIVING FULL REGARD TO THE NEED FOR CONSERVATION AND TO ENCOURAGE AND ARRANGE THE INTERCHANGE OF KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE IN THE PRACTICE AND SCIENCE OF AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY AND AQUACULTURE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING METHODS AND TECHNIQUES IN CROP AND LIVESTOCK PRODUCTION AND AS AN ANCILLARY TO THE FORGOING OBJECT: 1. TO ENCOURAGE, STRENGTHEN AND IMPROVE THE EXISTING RELATIONSHIPS AND BONDS BOTH INDIVIDUALLY AND COLLECTIVELY BETWEEN VARIOUS AGRICULTURAL SOCIETIES WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH; 2. TO ASSIST THE MEMBER SOCIETIES TO CARRY OUT THEIR OBJECTS BY ARRANGING FOR THEIR REPRESENTATIVES OR DELEGATES TO HOLD CONFERENCES THUS ENABLING THE INTERCHANGE OF IDEAS AND DISCUSSIONS OF MUTUAL PROBLEMS; 3. TO ENCOURAGE THE PROMOTION AND EXTENSION OF AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE COMMONWEALTH; 4. IN COUNTRIES WHERE THEY DO NOT EXIST, TO ENCOURAGE THE FORMATION OF VOLUNTARY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETIES AND THEIR FUNCTION IN PROMOTING THE ABOVE OBJECTS; 5. TO ENCOURAGE THE EXCHANGE OF YOUNG FARMERS, TECHNICIANS AND REPRESENTATIVES OF ALL THE PROFESSIONS ALLIED TO FARMING; AND 6. TO KEEP UNDER REVIEW IMPORT AND EXPORT STANDARDS BETWEEN THE COUNTRIES OF THE MEMBER SOCIETIES IN SO FAR AS THEY ACCEPT THE MOVEMENT AND HEALTH OF LIVESTOCK AND THE QUALITY OF AGRICULTURAL PROCEDURE.
Area of benefit
THE COMMONWEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Norfolk Agricultural Ass.
Norfolk Showground
Dereham Road
NORWICH
NR5 0TT
- Phone:
- 01603748931
- Email:
- info@therasc.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window