Financial history WORD FOUNTAIN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1102347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £73.55k £73.35k £78.97k £89.71k £94.92k
Total expenditure £67.98k £52.41k £78.76k £79.38k £82.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A