JURASSIC COAST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jurassic Coast Trust's role is to protect and conserve the Dorset & East Devon Coast World Heritage Site for current and future generations, and to enable the World Heritage Status to be of benefit to people. We do this through engagement, learning, advocacy, community development, skills promotion and volunteering. We are the only organisation who's sole role it is to look after this Site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £100,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £63,940 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 December 2003: Standard registration
- WORLD HERITAGE COAST TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fritha Costain | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Larwood | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Philbrick | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bermingham | Trustee | 16 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Wokersien | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
STUART HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £410.38k | £311.01k | £263.37k | £335.11k | £294.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £438.90k | £304.39k | £323.15k | £332.23k | £279.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £14.00k | N/A | N/A | £100.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £232.18k | £211.52k | £110.00k | £110.00k | £63.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 6 NOVEMBER 2003 AMENDED ON 25 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION AND PRESENTATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF THE DORSET AND EAST DEVON COAST (JURASSIC COAST) WORLD HERITAGE SITE, RECOGNISED BY THE UNITED NATIONS EDUCATIONAL SCIENTIFIC AND CULTURAL ORGANISATION (UNESCO) AS HAVING SUCH OUTSTANDING UNIVERSAL VALUE THAT IT WARRANTS BEING INSCRIBED ON THE WORLD HERITAGE LIST THROUGH THE POWERS OF THE CONVENTION CONCERNING THE PROTECTION OF THE WORLD CULTURAL AND NATURAL HERITAGE (1972) AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO UNDERTAKE THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OF THE SITE AND ITS SETTING (2) THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE OUTSTANDING UNIVERSAL VALUE OF THE SITE AND OF ITS SETTING (3) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE SIGNIFICANCE AND VALUES OF THE SITE AND THE WORLD HERITAGE CONVENTION (4) TO PROMOTE AND CONTRIBUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE PERTAINING TO THE SITE (5) TO PREPARE, REVIEW, MONITOR, IMPLEMENT AND COORDINATE THE DELIVERY OF THE MANAGEMENT PLAN RELATING TO THE SITE AS AGREED BETWEEN UNESCO AND THE UK GOVERNMENT AND AS AMENDED AND UPDATED FROM TIME TO TIME INSOFAR AS SUCH ACTIVITIES MAY REASONABLY BE REGARDED AS ANALOGOUS TO OR WITHIN THE SPIRIT OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN SECTION 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011
Area of benefit
DEVON AND DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANTONY BATTY & COMPANY LLP
3 FIELD COURT
LONDON
WC1R 5EF
- Phone:
- 02078311234
- Email:
- BESA@ANTONYBATTY.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window