BUDE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral Singing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 05 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Charles Puddick | Chair | 01 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Eibhlis Patrick | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Daniels | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Twiston Davies | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Felicity Anne Kershaw | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennie Hillman | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Frost | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA FIELD | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.40k | £7.44k | £113 | £12.66k | £15.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.48k | £7.14k | £1.04k | £10.76k | £14.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2011 as amended on 03 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF, THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; (II) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHAL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tredown
Warbstow
LAUNCESTON
Cornwall
PL15 8UT
- Phone:
- 01566781845
- Email:
- drpuddick@mac.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window