LONGCOT AND FERNHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1101141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Running local School fundraising events to support learning and the children's experiences within the school as well as to buy additional equipment for Longcot and Fernham C.E. School. Main events are seasonal Fairs, such as Christmas and Summer social events, along with small raffles and sales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024

Total income: £10,038
Total expenditure: £3,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ashley Brown Trustee 21 March 2024
THE PLACE
Received: On time
Georgina Whitaker Trustee 31 January 2023
None on record
Maryanne Webb Mrs Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2020 30/10/2021 30/10/2022 30/10/2023 30/10/2024
Total gross income £8.17k £8.32k £5.23k £5.41k £10.04k
Total expenditure £6.53k £10.99k £5.23k £4.62k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Longcot & Fernham Primary School
King's Lane
Longcot
Faringdon
SN7 7SY
Phone:
01793782381