Financial history TURNER'S HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1111653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £268.78k £130.07k £104.84k £157.33k £152.54k
Total expenditure £191.96k £134.82k £182.71k £162.42k £153.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £79.92k £35.27k £9.00k N/A N/A