THE NASIO TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND TRAINING; HEALTH PRESERVATION, HIV/AIDS HEALTH PROMOTION; VOLUNTEERING PROGRAMME; CAPACITY BUILDING TRAINING FOR GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS; PREVENTATIVE WORK; SPORTS ACTIVITIES; INTERNATIONAL PROGRAMMES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 24 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Budgen CBE | Chair | 22 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Thomas Nhachi | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amber Anya Vetta | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Bown | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NEIL PASSINGHAM | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Russell | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|||||
LILIAN ONORIODE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.45k | £285.76k | £335.64k | £429.94k | £457.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.93k | £286.33k | £359.33k | £426.08k | £434.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 08/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 29 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 17 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
(1. RELIEVE POVERTY, UNEMPLOYMENT, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM, OR HAVE BEEN ORPHANED AS A RESULT OF HIV. 2. PROVIDE A RANGE OF FACILITIES FOR THE MEDICAL CARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT, RECREATION, LEISURE AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE THE NEED OF ANY OR ALL OF THESE FACILITIES BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES REGARDLESS OF THEIR YOUTH OR AGE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3 ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
KENYA ENGLAND & WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 The Chambers
Vineyard
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 3FE
- Phone:
- 01235611200
- Email:
- info@thenasiotrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window