Financial history GRACE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1103021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £456.35k £896.90k £893.42k £1.33m £1.67m
Total expenditure £624.38k £699.12k £888.72k £1.29m £1.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £894.77k £893.42k £1.33m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £2.14k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £699.12k £888.72k £1.29m £1.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.48k £6.05k £94.34k £116.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0