JSSC

Charity Number: 1107141
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

JSSC operates under the name Skills for Justice. It is the Sector Skills Council for the justice, community safety, legal and financial services, local govt and Armed Services sectors. It works with employers, stakeholders and key partners across the U.K. to ensure that those who work in these sectors are equipped with appropriate skills to enable them to be productive, effective and efficient.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2004: Standard registration
  • 28 May 2015: Funds received from 1140358 FINANCIAL SKILLS PARTNERSHIP
  • 12 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1143246 THE WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED
  • 12 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • JUSTICE AND SECTOR SKILLS COUNCIL (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £4.33m £5.67m £9.14m £4.77m £1.13m
Total expenditure £4.44m £5.65m £9.13m £6.05m £1.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.75m £1.13m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £1.53m £0 £1.96m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £346.54k £435.07k £845.33k £898.70k £234.47k
Income - Charitable activities £2.41m £5.21m £6.71m £4.08m £896.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.35k £25.90k £23.96k £3.99k £1.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 -£398.30k -£211.33k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.09m £4.98m £7.77m £5.79m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £261.34k
Expenditure - Governance £45.35k £69.62k £77.77k £74.86k £4.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £298.85k £596.54k £1.29m £186.13k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Own use assets £42.80k £162.72k £122.43k £38.63k £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £3.36m £3.53m £4.23m £2.27m £0
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £904.70k £1.17m £1.82m £1.05m £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 July 2017 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 July 2017 155 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 23 January 2015 On Time