Financial history THE INCOGNITO THEATRE GROUP

Charity Number: 1102558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £27.03k £4.49k £24.76k £32.05k £39.81k
Total expenditure £19.36k £7.92k £18.11k £32.17k £28.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A