RAMSBOTTOM MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The organisation of an annual, three day, mainly competitive music festival open to amateurs of all ages comprising classes in primary school instrument groups, primary school choirs (part and unison), senior choirs, piano, brass, strings, acoustic and electric guitar, woodwind, electronic keyboard, light vocal, Drums, classical vocal and mixed ensembles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £2,788
Total expenditure: £2,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Henthorn Chair 09 June 2021
None on record
Karl Taylor Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Helen Holt Trustee 17 June 2016
None on record
Lindsay Hunter Trustee 18 June 2014
None on record
Christopher Hopkinson Trustee 31 October 2013
WIGAN AND LEIGH HOSPICE
Received: On time
MARJORIE BURGUM Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH, BURY CIRCUIT 06/08
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.82k £2.54k £2.45k £2.23k £2.79k
Total expenditure £4.40k £1.91k £3.21k £2.11k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 08 March 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 April 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
147 BRADSHAW ROAD
BOLTON
BL2 3EN
Phone:
01204596950