THE INCLUSIVE CHURCH NETWORK

Charity Number: 1102676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advocacy and promotion within the Church of England and world-wide church for the full inclusion of all people in the worldwide church, including the threefold order of ordained ministry regardless of ethnicity, gender and sexual orientation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £51,527
Total expenditure: £32,827

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • INCLUSIVE CHURCH.NET (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Yin-An Chen Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Meredith Elana Ford Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Sarah Jane Ball Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Rev Alison Mary Kerr Trustee 11 July 2024
SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN WELCARE
Received: On time
THE ROCHESTER DIOCESAN SOCIETY AND BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Alex Frost Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Rev Rosalind Elisabeth Rutherford Trustee 06 December 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
Alison Webster Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Hanna Yoo Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Jack Peter Woodruff Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Rev Rachele Evelyn vernon Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Michael John David Bishop Trustee 18 September 2019
THE FRIENDS OF GUILDFORD CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
GUILDFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Fiona Mary Rhona MacMillan Trustee 13 July 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS, LONDON
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Recently registered
Daniel Simon Barnes-Davies Trustee 06 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.77k £35.35k £37.98k £49.05k £51.53k
Total expenditure £40.54k £33.82k £31.55k £33.17k £32.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 TRINITY CHURCHYARD
GUILDFORD
SURREY
GU1 3RR
Phone:
07935374877