MUSIC OF LIFE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MUSIC OF LIFE FOUNDATION OFFERS HIGH-QUALITY MUSICAL TRAINING AND PERFORMING OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND SPECIAL NEEDS WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND MEDICAL CONDITIONS. IT PROVIDES ACCESS TO ALL ITS EVENTS INCLUDING ADAPTED TRANSPORT AND CARERS. ITS FOCUS IS ON DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN WHO HAVE EXTREMELY LIMITED OR NO ACCESS TO MUSIC-MAKING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2004: Standard registration
- MUSIC OF LIFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAY ALLAN LONGBOTTOM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Schepherd-Evans | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Mary Kembery | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valentina Di Venuta | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Dearnaley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tristen Hennigs | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander McHardy | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lily Harriss | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stefano Filippi | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Bruggemann | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.00k | £151.77k | £163.33k | £212.12k | £239.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.03k | £140.63k | £172.61k | £235.04k | £239.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 2003. as amended on 20 Jun 2019 as amended on 30 Jul 2019 as amended on 30 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED CHILDREN IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC BY:- I) PROVIDING ACCESS TO FACILITIES FOR STUDY, FOR CREATIVE DEVELOPMENT AND ACCESS TO BOTH STANDARD AND CREATIVE ORGANISATIONS, ON EQUAL TERMS WITH OTHER CHILDREN; II) THE ORGANISATION OF NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL MUSICAL EVENTS, COMPETITIONS AND CONCERTS IN WHICH DISABLED CHILDREN CAN PARTICIPATE THUS HELPING THEM TO REALISE THEIR POTENTIAL; AND III) SUPPORTING RESEARCH UNDERTAKEN INTO THE EDUCATIONAL AND THERAPEUTIC USE OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED CHILDREN. 3.2 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ABOVE-MENTIONED PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED CHILDREN THROUGH THE USE OF THE ART OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Portland Place
LONDON
W1B 1DY
- Phone:
- 02078135472
- Email:
- mofl@mofl.co.uk
- Website:
-
musicoflife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window