SOUTH HILL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OPEARATES A PRESCHOOL OFFERING 275 PLACES (10 SESSIONS AND 5 LUNCH CLUB SESSIONS PER WEEK) WITH HEATH LANE EXTENDED CARE FACILITY WITHIN A PURPOSE BUILT BUILDING. FUTHER SERVICES INCLUDE CARER AND TODDLER GROUPS, TEACHING ENGLISH TO SPEAKERS OF OTHER LANGUAGES. PROVIDING TASTER LEARNING SESSIONS PROVIDED BY LOCAL EDUCATION PROVIDERS AND PROVISON OF FACILITIES FOR LOCAL ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £103,452 from 11 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN GEOFFREY OAKES | Chair |
|
||||||
Kathryn Sian McKerrell | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Rafuluchi Moh | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Mann | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Wright | Trustee | 07 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leonard Boggis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £461.54k | £450.26k | £472.18k | £527.69k | £487.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.90k | £490.97k | £481.59k | £497.09k | £495.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.98k | N/A | £117.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.80k | £47.84k | £187.11k | £265.02k | £103.45k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £358.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £164.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £149 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.43k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £497.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES (WHETHER IN A PURPOSE-BUILT COMMUNITY CENTRE OR OTHERWISE) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF HEMEL HEMPSTEAD AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, SOUTH AFRICA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE WHICH FACILITIES MAY WITHOUT LIMITATION INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF CHILD CARE SERVICES AND MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RAVE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Hill Centre
Cemetery Hill
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 1JF
- Phone:
- 01442234617
- Email:
- Shc@southhillcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window