ARMONICO CONSORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION, THROUGH PUBLIC CONCERTS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, IN THE APPRECIATION OF CHORAL, OPERA, BAROQUE AND RENAISSANCE MUSIC, AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF MUSICAL AND OTHER LIFE SKILLS FOR THE PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND EMOTIONAL BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £5,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2004: Standard registration
- ARMONICO CONSORT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BOYDEN | Chair | 18 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN CHARLES HARBOUR CBE | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN ROBERT SAMPSON QC | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Claire Monks | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £568.86k | £588.08k | £547.98k | £737.85k | £683.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £550.34k | £601.41k | £578.48k | £936.58k | £658.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £55.00k | N/A | N/A | £12.50k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £7.00k | N/A | £2.50k | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £275.67k | £284.68k | £216.15k | £370.26k | £275.20k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.83k | £0 | £0 | £6.98k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £283.37k | £303.40k | £331.83k | £360.61k | £90.61k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £141 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £510.45k | £526.04k | £517.49k | £868.78k | £619.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £39.88k | £75.38k | £60.99k | £67.80k | £38.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.82k | £0 | £4.47k | £4.39k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.68k | £2.92k | £3.32k | £4.71k | £3.34k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £140.12k | £52.02k | £96.89k | £110.66k | £71.72k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £165.96k | £90.41k | £166.19k | £380.08k | £314.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF CHORAL AND ORCHESTRAL MUSIC, PRIMARILY OF THE RENAISSANCE AND BAROQUE PERIODS BY PROMOTING OR PARTICIPATING IN PUBLIC CONCERTS: 3.2 TO ENCOURAGE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY ORGANISING AND PARTICIPATING INA SCHOOLS EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMME.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 New Street
WARWICK
CV34 4RX
- Phone:
- 01926800109
- Email:
- LCOUPER@ARMONICO.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window