Financial history ELLESMERE COLLEGE LIMITED

Charity number: 1103049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.36m £9.57m £9.57m £12.18m £12.84m
Total expenditure £10.02m £9.54m £10.73m £12.49m £13.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.11m £7.72k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £54.89k £32.57k £20.24k £56.50k
Income - Other trading activities £92.40k £55.49k £220.02k £635.89k £750.63k
Income - Charitable activities £9.08m £8.35m £9.98m £11.45m £11.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.26k £8.28k £6.69k £7.31k £7.67k
Income - Other £1.88k £1.11m £141.94k £62.57k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.89m £8.54m £9.41m £10.57m £11.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.13m £1.00m £1.31m £1.91m £1.83m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £2.35k £2.52k £2.47k £2.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0