Financial history MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION

Charity number: 1105321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.81m £2.82m £2.28m £1.97m £1.91m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.30m £2.16m £2.44m £2.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.47m £2.48m £1.92m £1.58m £1.48m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £327.99k £338.88k £354.12k £367.82k £384.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.15k £1.66k £198 £5.80k £23.25k
Income - Other £10.12k £0 £0 £22.45k £15.03k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £18.99k £22.35k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.09m £1.86m £1.96m £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £135.45k £215.65k £292.07k £486.11k £347.93k
Expenditure - Governance £24.45k £13.63k £9.09k £46.26k £76.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £435.98k £817.92k £482.60k £285.85k £164.23k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0