COTTINGLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
- COTTINGLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE COTTINGLEY CORNERSTONE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lindsay H Pearson | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Peers | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Parker | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA SMITH | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR DOUG THRELFALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY PETER HESSELWOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.81k | £382.32k | £396.40k | £352.28k | £329.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.62k | £285.06k | £319.47k | £308.52k | £290.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £104.87k | £83.58k | £73.47k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COTTINGLEY IN THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL IN WEST YORKSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; TO RELIEVE DISABILITY AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS; B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COTTINGLEY CORNERSTONE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF COTTINGLEY IN THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL IN WEST YORKSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cottingley Community Centre
Littlelands
BINGLEY
West Yorkshire
BD16 1AL
- Phone:
- 01274518280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window