Financial history ALCOHELP

Charity number: 1104811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.37k £20.55k £22.40k £15.62k £17.81k
Total expenditure £24.39k £17.91k £21.36k £21.52k £17.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A