PARENT CHEERLEADER ASSOCIATION OF THE CARSHALTON CHEERLEADERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the recreation and leisure time occupation for young people under the age of 25 by the provision of training and performing cheerleading activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Sutton
Governance
- 24 June 2004: Standard registration
- 18 November 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 November 2021: Funds transferred to 219830 MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH)
- CARSHALTON CHEERLEADERS PALACE CRYSTALS (Working name)
- PCACC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.05k | £6.26k | £4.80k | £1.04k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £1.83k | £700 | £1.38k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 25 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2003, AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND PERFORMING IN CHEERLEADING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window