Financial history ASTBURY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.01k £1.06k £2.21k £2.34k £2.07k
Total expenditure £1.34k £987 £1.64k £1.82k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A