LANCASTER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through a managed approach we aim to provide information, advice and assistance which is accessible, resposive to need empowering for the clientand of a consistently high quality. The Bureau works within the aims and principles of hte CAB service to address issues raised by social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.60k | £295.66k | £405.37k | £321.89k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £319.35k | £283.98k | £299.94k | £318.09k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 October 2012 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 15 August 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 21 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 28 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN LANCASTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY IN LANCASTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window