NATIONAL RAILWAY HERITAGE AWARDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and conservof the buildings and infrastructure of the national railway networks of Great Br1tain and Ireland, past and present, whether for transport or other purposes, for the continued benefit of the public, and the advancement of education of the public in railway preservation, in particular but not exclusively by the establishment and maintnance of an Archive of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 January 2005: Standard registration
- 13 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1201052 NATIONAL RAILWAY HERITAGE AWARDS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.95k | £58.25k | £45.52k | £52.31k | £57.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.52k | £50.36k | £18.58k | £43.89k | £47.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 DECEMBER 2004 as amended on 08 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
The Trustees shall hold the Trust fund and its income upon Trust and apply them to: i. the advancement and promotion of the heritage of the built railway environment by raising awareness of outstanding preservation, conservation or re-generation of the historic railway buildings and infrastructure of the United Kingdom and Republic of Ireland for the continued benefit of the public; and ii. the advancement and promotion of community development and the built environment through the re-use of historic railway buildings for community purposes; and iii. the advancement and promotion of education on the heritage of railways for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively by the establishment and maintenance of an archive of the National Railway Heritage Awards.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window