THE HOPE CENTRE ST HELENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre provides, assessment, information, advice and guidance through personally tailored action plans. The Training Department offers 1. Computer Training 2. Breathe Wellbeing Programme (Confidence, Assertiveness and Mentoring) 3. Advice, Advocacy and Support for Homeless People 4. Christmas Homeless Shelter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- St Helens
Governance
- 24 May 2004: Standard registration
- THE HOPE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FRANCIS RYAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Sweeney | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Schafer | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brendan McDonagh | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Craig Lawrenson | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Thomas Kelly | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.58k | £391.23k | £377.14k | £381.04k | £381.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.20k | £238.70k | £127.85k | £303.36k | £303.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.87k | £65.00k | £36.03k | N/A | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/2004 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2011
Charitable objects
) “TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ST HELENS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN SUCH DOING TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST. II) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. A) FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL OR DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; HOMELESSNESS OR POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOR MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS). III) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN ST HELENS BY PROVIDING EDUCATION; TRAINING AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED”.
Area of benefit
IN ST. HELENS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Life Centre
Atherton Street
ST. HELENS
WA10 2DT
- Phone:
- 01744617148
- Email:
- info@hopecentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window