THE WILLIAM AND PATRICIA VENTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The support & relief of the elderly. (2) To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care & attention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hone | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Timothy Hill | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Saunby | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.86k | £73.01k | £93.79k | £88.38k | £84.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.38k | £148.68k | £78.66k | £22.00k | £113.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 11 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 14 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
3. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES THAT IS TO SAY:- 3.1 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND ENDOWMENT (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OR EITHER OF THEM) ACQUISITION PROVISION DEVELOPMENT ENLARGEMENT CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT FITTING OUT FURNISHING DECORATION MAINTENANCE REPAIR INSURANCE IMPROVEMENT RECONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL UPKEEP OF DAY CENTRES IN CITIES TOWNS AND VILLAGES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES AND THE PAYMENT OF ALL OUTGOINGS IN CONNECTION WITH AND THE GENERAL EXPENSES OF CARRYING ON AND MANAGING SUCH DAY CENTRES 3.2 THE ASSISTANCE OF THE BENEFICIARIES OR ANY OF THEM BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD AND OTHER FACILITIES AT SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ENSURE THAT THE COST TO THE BENEFICIARIES OF FOOD AND OTHER FACILITIES PROVIDED BY AND AT SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID IS KEPT AS LOW AS POSSIBLE 3.3 THE ASSISTANCE OF THE BENEFICIARIES OR ANY OF THEM BY THE PROVISION OF MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID OR THE PAYMENT OF ALL OR ANY PART OF THEIR TRAVELLING EXPENSES TO AND FROM SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID AS SHALL IN EITHER CASE BE APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ENSURE THAT THE COST TO THE BENEFICIARIES OF SUCH TRANSPORTATION OR TRAVEL IS KEPT AS LOW AS POSSIBLE 3.4 THE RELIEF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESCUE HOMES OR FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS 3.5 THE MAKING OR PROVISION (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OR EITHER OF THEM) OF DONATIONS GRANTS LOANS OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO: (I) AGE CONCERN OR ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION TRUST ORGANISATION INSTITUTION OR BODY CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED WHICH IS FOR THE TIME BEING A REGISTERED CHARITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSES (1) (2) AND (3) OF THIS CLAUSE 3 (II) THE RSPCA OR ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION TRUST ORGANISATION INSTITUTION OR BODY CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED WHICH IS FOR THE TIME BEING A REGISTERED CHARITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSE (4) OF THIS CLAUSE 3 3.6 THE MAKING (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OF EITHER OF THEM) IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT OF DONATIONS OR GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS ORGANISATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR BODIES CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED HAVING THEIR SOLE OR PRINCIPAL OBJECTS: (I) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO BY REASON OF OLD AGE OR INFIRMITY ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OR SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES; OR (II) THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS AND THE PREVENTION OR SUPPRESSION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS OR SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southlands
9 Southlands
Kettering
Northants
NN15 7QG
- Phone:
- 01536414102
- Email:
- info@venton-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window