MOP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 2004, MOP Foundation promotes Iranian art and culture to a wider audience outside of Iran, and strives to make a notable contribution to its long-term advancement worldwide. This is accomplished by establishing programmes in modern and contemporary Iranian art, music, media and academia in partnership with world-class institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 June 2004: Standard registration
- MOP (Working name)
- THE MAGIC OF PERSIA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nina Ansary | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Sanam Oveyssi | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHIRIN ELGHANYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS ELGHNIAN-KRAYEM ELGHANIAN-KRAYEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VADJIHEH SOLEYMANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.50k | £168.30k | £50.89k | £61.93k | £47.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.11k | £151.28k | £98.94k | £78.43k | £41.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/07/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF PERSIAN CULTURE AND PERSIANATE WORLD, AND (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE THE CHARITY WILL BE BIASED IN THE AND WILL OPERATE MAINLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
328A Kings Road
LONDON
SW3 5UH
- Phone:
- 07831882884
- Email:
- shirley@magicofpersia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window