THE BEDFORDSHIRE MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports music activities for young people and adults in Beds and surrounding areas. Following the demise of Bedfordshire Music, we have become responsible for operating the holiday youth music ensemble courses in the former county and advising on policy with the local Music Hubs. Our aim is to provide access to musical opportunities for young musicians appropriate to their abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £6,850 from 8 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 12 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SHEEHAN | Chair | 27 February 2014 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER BROWN BEd ARCM | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JULIA SMITH | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Anne Russell | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Justin Waters | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|||||
NICK WOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN JOHN GREENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.92k | £35.92k | £31.14k | £46.81k | £37.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.75k | £33.75k | £24.13k | £43.34k | £36.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.60k | N/A | £7.00k | N/A | £6.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £980 | N/A | £6.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, APPRECIATION, ENJOYMENT AND PARTICIPATION IN MUSIC AND THE PERFORMING ARTS FOR SCHOOL CHILDREN AND PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The White House
Odell Road
Sharnbrook
Bedford
- Phone:
- 07711768365
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window