DAYLIGHT CHRISTIAN PRISON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith and education, and to relieve persons in condition of need or hardship, aged or sick, particularly but not exclusively in prisons and amongst the families of prisoners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 July 2004: Standard registration
- DAYLIGHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Brendan Diaper | Chair | 19 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Alan Sewell | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Keith Killingley | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James David McMaster | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN HARE | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Graham Thrussell | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL TIMOTHY TOMS | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.70k | £158.57k | £187.65k | £119.47k | £115.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.15k | £112.18k | £160.02k | £105.03k | £121.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.34k | £2.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 25 MAR 2025
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PRISONS AND AMONGST THE FAMILIES OF PRISONERS) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG PRISONERS) IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PRISONERS AND THEIR FAMILIES) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 NEW LONDON ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0RG
- Phone:
- 01245252735
- Email:
- office@daylightcpt.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window