THE SAVANNAH EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust aims to provide an education for some of Ghana's most needy children, through the provision of infant and primary schools, and associated feeding and teacher training programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
Governance
- 14 July 2004: Standard registration
- 26 September 2024: Funds received from 1021175 TANNER TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BENJAMIN RAMSBOTTOM MA, MST | Chair | 23 June 2004 |
|
|||||
Dr Helen Skelton | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Roe | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howard Cooper BA | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ANDREW RAMSBOTTOM BSC PGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD OLIVER HICKMAN | Trustee | 23 June 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.32k | £330.32k | £471.13k | £348.32k | £334.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £387.87k | £218.92k | £266.88k | £372.28k | £321.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS LIVING IN GHANA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE CREATION OF SELF-SUPPORTING SCHOOLS IN THE UPPER WEST REGION.
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 APPLEDORE GARDENS
LINDFIELD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 2EU
- Phone:
- 01444483884
- Email:
- paul@savannahtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window